Gianfrancisco v. School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado
Plaintiff: Carol Gianfrancisco
Defendant: School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2014cv00687
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal with prejudice 26 it is ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/3/15.(evana, )
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/21/2014 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 17, 2014, lead counsel present in person, and initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014. (jsmit )
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/2/2014.(evana, )
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/28/2014.(jsmit)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute ORDER re: 11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign the case in accordance with the applicable Pilot Program by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/27/2014. (agarc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gianfrancisco v. School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Gianfrancisco
Represented By: Sharyn E. Dreyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Mary Barham Gray
Represented By: Susanne Naomi Starecki Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?