Wallen et al v. Kelly Pipe Co., L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Carol Wallen and John Wallen
Defendant: Kelly Pipe Co., L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00717
Filed: March 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File F.R.C.P. 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/14.(sgrim)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/5/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2015. Four day Jury Trial set for 4/6/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/16/14. (sgrim)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 7/16/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 7/16/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/2/14. (sgrim)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2014 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/10/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/13/2014. (eseam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallen et al v. Kelly Pipe Co., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Pipe Co., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wallen
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?