DiGiallonardo v. McCaddon Cadillac Buick GMC Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Connie DiGiallonardo
Defendant: Mary McDonald, McCaddon Cadillac Buick GMC Inc. and Mark McCaddon
Case Number: 1:2014cv00747
Filed: March 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER of Dismissal re 44 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/29/2014. (athom, )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/24/2014. (slibi, )
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration. The Final Pretrial Conference and the Trial Preparation Conference set 5/15/2015, are VACATED and is CONTINUED pending further order of court. The jury trial set to commence 6/1/2015, is VACATED and is CONTINUED pending further order of court. Telephone Conference set for 12/2/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/3/2014. (alowe)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Trial Date. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/29/2014.(alowe)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 5/15/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set 6/1/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/16/14. (rebsec)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/15/14. (lgale)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Stipulated Motion To Partially Dismiss With Prejudice. All of plaintiff's claims against defendant, Mark McCaddon, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By July 31, 2014, the remaining parties SHALL FILE a joint status report identifying which claims remain pending. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/10/2014.(klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiGiallonardo v. McCaddon Cadillac Buick GMC Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCaddon Cadillac Buick GMC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McCaddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie DiGiallonardo
Represented By: Sarah J. Parady
Represented By: Mary Josephine Lowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?