Wilke v. Jefferson County School District R-1 et al
Plaintiff: Teri Wilke
Defendant: David (I) Kollar, Angelina (I) Medina, Sherry Hon, Jason Firestone, David Kollar, Angelina Medina, Jefferson County School District R-1, Jason (I) Firestone and Sherry (I) Hon
Case Number: 1:2014cv00748
Filed: March 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 THIRD AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/18/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/18/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/29/14. (sgrim)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SECOND AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/13/2014 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/13/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/25/14. (sgrim)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 7/30/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 7/30/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/28/14. (sgrim)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2014 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/19/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/21/2014. (eseam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilke v. Jefferson County School District R-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) Kollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelina (I) Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Hon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelina Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County School District R-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason (I) Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry (I) Hon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Wilke
Represented By: Patricia S. Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?