United States Welding Inc v. Tecsys Inc

Plaintiff: United States Welding, Inc.
Defendant: Tecsys, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00778
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2016 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL: The combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for May 6, 2016, and the trial set to begin May 16, 2016, are vacated and continued without date. On May 6, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. (MDT) counsel for the parties shall contact the court's administrative assistant to reschedule the combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference and the trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/25/16. (kfinn)
April 20, 2016 273 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2016. Granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will award fees and costs for the Defendant for this proceeding. Mr. Toll shall advise the Court by e-mail no later than the close of business on Friday if he intends to take supplemental deposition. FTR: Courtroom A-501. (amont, )
March 29, 2016 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 130 Motion To Strike Defendants FirstAmended Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/29/2016.(cmira)
March 28, 2016 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Concerning Motions to Exclude Opinion Testimony: Granting in part and Denying in part 122 Motion To Exclude Portions of Eric Kimberling's Expert Report; Granting in part and Denying in part 123 Objections To and Motion To Strike D efendant Tecsys, Inc.'s Rule 26(a) Initial Expert Disclosure and that neither Eric Kimberling nor Jean- Francois Landry may testify to opinions, expert or otherwise, using the specialized legal terms which define the claims of US Welding in this case. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/28/2016.(cmira)
February 3, 2016 240 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 205 Motion to Strike ; Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2016. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
January 6, 2016 226 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER That trial by jury shall commence May 16, 2016, at 8:30 a.m. (MDT), That the court reserves eight (8) days for trial: Monday, May 16, 2016, through Thursday, May 19, 2016, and Monday, May 23, 2016, through Thursday, May 26, 2016; That a combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference (conference) shall commence on May 6, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. (MDT), in courtroom A1001, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/6/2016. (evana, )
January 5, 2016 225 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 221 Unopposed Motion for Order Restricting Access to Certain Exhibits to Defendant's Motion to Strike; granting 222 Unopposed Motion for Order Restricting Access to Defendant's Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/05/2016.(slibi, )
December 17, 2015 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 208 Report and Recommendations as an order of this court. That the combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for January 22, 2016, and the trial se t to begin February 8, 2016, are vacated and continued without date, pending further order; That on January 5, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. (MST) counsel for the parties shall contact the courts administrative assistant at (303) 335-2350 to reschedule the combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference and the concomitant trial; That the trial shall be scheduled for eight (8) trial days; That counsel for the plaintiff shall arrange and coordinate the conference call necessary to facilitate the telephonic setting conference; That the Trial Preparation Conference Order 75 entered January 27, 2015, is amended and supplemented accordingly. Telephone Conference set for 1/5/2016 11:30 AM, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/2015.(evana, )
November 19, 2015 198 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Late-Disclosed Witnesses. Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2015; Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/10/2015 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
October 7, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion for Leave to Designate an Expert on Damages. Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2015. It is ORDERED that the plaintiff may have the client representative prepare a report addressing the defendant's expert report on damages. Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/19/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave, ) Modified on 10/8/2015 to unseal (mdave, ).
September 3, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 47 is approved and adopted as an order of this court. Overruling 54 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Granting in part and denying in part 32 Defendant Tecsys, Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Renewed Motion to Strike. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/3/2015.(mlace, )
June 4, 2015 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion to Strike Defendant Tecsys, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/4/2015. The affirmative defenses set forth in Tecsys April 13, 2015 Answer to the Complaint [docket #89] are stricken. Tecsys shall file an Amended Answer in conformance with the federal rules and this order on or before 6/19/2015.(mdave, )
June 1, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Sanctions; denying 102 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing held on 6/1/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave, )
May 26, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 111 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/26/2015. Discovery due by 9/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2015. (mdave, )
April 29, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 99 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/29/2015.(mdave )
April 21, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Motion for Sealing Response to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff United States Welding Inc's Response to Tecsys' Motion for Imposition of Sanctions [# 83 ] shall be maintained under Level 1 restriction as defined by D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2(b). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/21/2015. (alowe)
April 13, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Plaintif's Motion to Extend Discovery and to Compel Answer by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/13/2015. Initial expert disclosures due by 5/4/2015. Rebuttal expert disclosure deadline 6/3/2015. Discovery due by 7/3/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2015.(mdave,)
January 27, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Motions due 6/17/2015. 8-Day Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/27/2015. (alowe)
January 22, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Designation of Non-Parties at Fault. Tecsys shall file an Amended Designation of Non-Party at Fault in conformance with this order on or before 2/6/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/22/2015.(alowe)
November 6, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/6/2014. (alowe)
November 3, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is a proposed Stipulated Protective Order (docket # 36 ); however, there is no motion nor other filing requesting entry of the proposed order. The parties shall file a motion regarding the proposed order on or before 11/5/2014; in addition, the parties shall provide a copy of the proposed order to the Court in useable format (Word, Word Perfect). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/3/2014.(alowe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Welding Inc v. Tecsys Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Welding, Inc.
Represented By: Marcus Stephen Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tecsys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?