Browne et al v. City of Grand Junction, Colorado
Plaintiff: Debra Browne, Mary Jane Sanchez, Cynthia Stewart, Steve Kilcrease, Humanists Doing Good and Eric Niederkruger
Defendant: City of Grand Junction, Colorado
Interested_party: Greenpeace, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00809
Filed: March 18, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk on 9/30/2015. (vbarn)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/20/15. Second Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Final Pretrial Conference # 107 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference set for September 8, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. is VACATED and RESET to December 11, 2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2015. (lgale, )
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. The City's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Doc. # 46 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Specifically, the Cit y's motion is GRANTED insofar as it argues that Plaintiff Niederkreuger fails to state a claim. Plaintiff Niederkreuger is, therefore, DISMISSED from this action and the caption will be so amended. The City's motion is DENIED insofar as it argues that Plaintiffs have failed to state First Amendment, Equal Protection, and Due Process claims. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/08/2015. (athom, )
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 98 Motion to Vacate. the Motion [# 98 ] is GRANTED in part to the extent it requests that the Final Pretrial Conference be reset to a later date. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2015 at 9:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 9/8/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2015. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/10/2015. (athom, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying without prejudice 55 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Clarify. The Court hereby clarifies that Alexis Gallegos is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/30/2015. (athom, )
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/29/2014.(athom, )
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to Intervene. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/25/2014.(athom, )
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The portion of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 6 ] seeking a temporary restraining order is GRANTED in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction remains pending. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/21/2014.(klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browne et al v. City of Grand Junction, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Browne
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Sanchez
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stewart
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Kilcrease
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humanists Doing Good
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Niederkruger
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Grand Junction, Colorado
Represented By: Josh Adam Marks
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?