Lucier v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heather Lucier
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00847
Filed: March 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 52 Motion to Compel Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/12/2015.(slibi, )
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint (Docket No. 44 ) be ACCEPTED FOR FILING. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2014.(alowe)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 32 RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DENYING 21 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. By Judge William J. Martinez on 11/5/2014.(alowe)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE : Recommending 21 Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement be denied, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/2/2014. (emill)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 9/30/2014.Taking under advisement 21 Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 5/8/2014, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 3 . Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Consent Form due by 5/8/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/24/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucier v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Joseph J. Lico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Lico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lucier
Represented By: Matthew R. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?