Import Fresh Direct LLC v. Premier Trading, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Import Fresh Direct LLC
Defendant: Direct Line Transportation LLC, Premier Trading, LLC, William Vogel and Anthony Filpi
Counter_claimant: Anthony Filpi, Direct Line Transportation LLC, Premier Trading, LLC and William Vogel
Counter_defendant: Import Fresh Direct LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00877
Filed: March 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Defendants Motion to Strike Entry of Judgment ECF No. 58 is GRANTED; and The Final Judgment ECF No. 57 is VACATED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/8/2014. (evana, )
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER granting 48 defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer, Counterclaim, and Jury Demand, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/25/2014.(evana, )
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Plaintiffs Motion to Modify Temporary Restraining Order, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/23/2014.(evana, )
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/27/2014. (evana, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Import Fresh Direct LLC v. Premier Trading, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Line Transportation LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Trading, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Vogel
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Filpi
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Import Fresh Direct LLC
Represented By: Robert John McCaffery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Anthony Filpi
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Direct Line Transportation LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Premier Trading, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: William Vogel
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Import Fresh Direct LLC
Represented By: Robert John McCaffery, Jr.
Represented By: Robert John McCaffery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?