Ortega v. Kerry et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ortega
Defendant: John Kerry, Jeh Johnson, Lori Scialabba and Andrew Lambrecht
Case Number: 1:2014cv00913
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2412
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, ORDER OF JUDGMENT by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/5/14. (jdyne, )
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/7/2014. (trlee, )
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three day bench trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on August 4, 2014 at 9:00 a.m.A Case Status Conference is set for July 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/16/2014. (rbjsec. )
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/03/2014. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Kerry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kerry
Represented By: Jessica A. Dawgert(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Jessica A. Dawgert(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Scialabba
Represented By: Jessica A. Dawgert(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Jessica A. Dawgert(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ortega
Represented By: Catherine A. Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?