Sheppard v. Weatherford International, LLC

Plaintiff: Mitch Sheppard
Defendant: Weatherford International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01000
Filed: April 8, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Stay re 97 Joint Status Report and Request for Extension of Stay and 99 Joint Status Report. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 04/21/2016. (cthom, )
March 15, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Request for Extension of Stay. It is ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed through April 15, 2016. The Parties shall file a joint status report regarding mediation and settlement on or before April 15, 2016. Ordered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 03/15/2016.(cthom, )
January 29, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF STAY. Re: 89 Status Report and Request for Extension of Stay. ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed through March 15, 2016. The Parties shall file a joint status report regarding mediation and settlement on or before March 15, 2016, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/29/2016. (agarc, )
December 10, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Request fro Extension of Stay. it is ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed through January 29, 2016. The Parties shall file a joint status report regarding mediation and settlement on or before January 29, 2016, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/10/2015. (cthom, )
September 16, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 77 Joint Status Report and Request for Extension of Stay. All proceedings in this case are stayed through 12/10/2015. Status Report due by 12/10/2015. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/16/2015. (athom, )
June 4, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 69 Motion to Stay, denying without prejudice and granting leave to refile 61 Motion to Dismiss, as outlined in the attached order. Status Report due by 9/14/2015. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/04/2015. (athom, )
October 21, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Agreed Motion to Approve Proposed Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit and Proposed Opt-In Consent Form (docketed as 'Motion for Discovery') by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/21/14.(cbssec)
August 4, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER signed and entered with interlineations by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/4/14. ORDERED that parties' 21 MOTION for Protective Order is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that when filing documents under seal parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2 and D.C.COLO. ECF. PROC. 5.1. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheppard v. Weatherford International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Sheppard
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Alexandra L. Koropey
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Steven Lezell Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford International, LLC
Represented By: Stefanie Robin Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?