W.J.Bradley Mortgage Capital, LLC v. Legacy Group Lending, Inc.
Plaintiff: W.J.Bradley Mortgage Capital, LLC
Defendant: Legacy Group Lending, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01103
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Each of the parties to bear their own fees and costs incurred in these actions, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/17/15. (ktera)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER 42 Denying Legacy's Motion to Amend Complaint, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/7/15. (ktera)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Withdrawing 35 WJB's Motion to Stay, WJBs motion to amend its answer is withdrawn. WJBs unopposed motion to amend its complaint is GRANTED. granting 38 WJB's Motion to modify the scheduling order. Discovery due by 4/13/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/24/2015.(evana, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion and Stipulationfor Entry of Protective Order for Confidential Disclosure of Discovery Materials, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/23/2015. (ktera)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery due by 3/30/2015 AND Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/3/2014. (jsmit)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/3/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on August 28, 2014, lead counsel present in person, and initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/21/2014. (jsmit)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCES : the July 31, 2014, scheduling conference is vacated, and the September 11, 2014, scheduling/planningconference set before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix in Civil Action No. 14-cv-01486- RPM is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/10/2014. (jsmit)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Consolidate Cases: Civil Action No. 14-cv-01103-RPM with Civil Action No. 14-cv-01486-KLM, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/9/2014.(jsmit)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/31/2014 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 24, 2014, lead counsel present in person, initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, and counsel for the defendant shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/11/2014. (jsmit)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.J.Bradley Mortgage Capital, LLC v. Legacy Group Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.J.Bradley Mortgage Capital, LLC
Represented By: Jon D. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Group Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?