Paros Properties LLC v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Paros Properties LLC
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv01190
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FINAL JUDGMENT. re 91 by clerk on 9/2/2015. (dhans, )
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Belated Second Supplemental Expert Disclosure of Edward Fronapfel 77 is SUBMITTED and TAKE N UNDER ADVISEMENT. Defendants' Motion for Spoliation of Evidence 65 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants 53 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/5/14. (bsimm, )
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand and Join an Additional defendant, Ohio Security Insurance Company by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/24/14.(dkals, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/11/14. (msksec, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND: Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Remand to State Court is DENIED. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/24/14.(msksec, )
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 8/7/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401, before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/23/14. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paros Properties LLC v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paros Properties LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Teresa Alt
Represented By: George Vernon Berg, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Colby Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lyndsay K. Arundel
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?