Norton v. Leohart
Plaintiff: Jason Thomas Norton
Defendant: Michele Leohart
Case Number: 1:2014cv01210
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/27/14. Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Cause of Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & (6) [#20] and on Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss [#26] are DENIED as moot. (lgale, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/11/14. Motion to Set Aside Administrative Forfeiture Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 983(e)(1) 1 is DENIED as moot. (lgale)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if appropriate, to a magistrate judge. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause 8 is discharged, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/09/2014. (slibi, )
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/30/14. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. Leohart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Thomas Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Leohart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?