Hamilton v. Farmers Insurance Group et al
Plaintiff: Priscilla P. Hamilton
Defendant: Bartholomew O. Baah and Farmer Insurance Group
Case Number: 1:2014cv01211
Filed: April 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Dismiss; granting 50 Report and Recommendations. by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/21/2015.(cthom, )
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing / Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/30/2015. Taking under advisement 41 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosec ute and Failure to Comply with Order of the Court. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 28 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 16 is GRANTED as to Defendant Farmers Insurance Group and DENIED as to Defendant Baah; and Defendant Farmers Insurance Group is hereby DISMISSED. This action shall proceed only as to Defendant Baah. by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/21/2014.(evana, ) (Modified on 11/21/2014 Duplicate entry, see 32 For Operative Order(evana, ).
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER denying Without Prejudice 29 Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/17/2014.(evana, )
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF. Status Conference set for 7/31/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/11/2014. (emill)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if appropriate, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/02/2014. (slibi, )
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/30/14. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Farmers Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla P. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartholomew O. Baah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmer Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?