Fiori, LLC v. Obvious Clothing, LLC
Plaintiff: Fiori, LLC
Defendant: Obvious Clothing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01244
Filed: May 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2015 Filing 34 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #33 stipulation to dismiss filed in this case. Text Only Entry (tscha, )
March 3, 2015 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff Fiori, LLC. (Blakely, Todd)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER re: #31 Notice of Settlement filed by Fiori, LLC. Dismissal Paper due by 3/10/2015. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/18/2014. (tscha, )
December 17, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Settlement - Joint by Plaintiff Fiori, LLC (Blakely, Todd)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/7/2014. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 4, 2014 Filing 29 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #28 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-01244-RM-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
November 4, 2014 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for Reassignment by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
October 30, 2014 Filing 27 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #26 Minute Order. Consent not achieved. This case is reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-01244-WYD-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/30/2014. (slibi, )
October 29, 2014 Filing 25 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Fiori, LLC. (Blakely, Todd)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CIVIL CASE SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/21/14. (lgale, )
October 21, 2014 Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/21/2014. Discovery due by 5/15/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/18/2015. Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/1/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom C204. (lgale, )
October 15, 2014 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Fiori, LLC. (Blakely, Todd)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #19 Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant Obvious Clothing LLC's Counterclaim, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/22/2014.(slibi, )
August 21, 2014 Filing 20 ANSWER/REPLY to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Fiori, LLC.(Blakely, Todd)
August 18, 2014 Filing 19 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Plaintiff Fiori, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Blakely, Todd)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathleen Kramer Custer terminated. Attorney Kathleen K. Custer is relieved of any further representation of Defendant. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Attorney Custer as counsel of record, and to remove this name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Defendant shall continue to be represented by Attorney David R. Fine, Attorney S. Derek Bauer, and Attorney Jeffrey R. Baxter. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/31/2014. Text Only Entry(klmlc2, )
July 31, 2014 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Obvious Clothing, LLC. (Custer, Kathleen)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/29/14. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant Obvious Clothing LLC's Counterclaim [Doc. No. 10] and First Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference and Related Deadlines [Doc. No. 6] [#15] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an answer or other response to Defendant's counterclaim on or before August 21, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for September 2,2014 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 10/21/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(lgale)
July 28, 2014 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #6 Order, , Unopposed MOTION to Reset by Plaintiff Fiori, LLC. (Blakely, Todd)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant Obvious Clothing LLC's Counterclaim, to on or before 7/31/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/2014. (eseam)
July 2, 2014 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Plaintiff Fiori, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Blakely, Todd)
June 17, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Derek Bauer on behalf of Obvious Clothing, LLCAttorney Stephen Derek Bauer added to party Obvious Clothing, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Stephen Derek Bauer added to party Obvious Clothing, LLC(pty:dft) (Bauer, Stephen)
June 17, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Pamela N. Hirschman on behalf of Fiori, LLCAttorney Pamela N. Hirschman added to party Fiori, LLC(pty:pla) (Hirschman, Pamela)
June 13, 2014 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jeffrey R. Baxter added to party Obvious Clothing, LLC(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Fiori, LLC by Obvious Clothing, LLC.(Baxter, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2014 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Custer, Kathleen)
May 19, 2014 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6.1(a) by Defendant Obvious Clothing, LLC. Obvious Clothing, LLC answer due 6/13/2014. (Fine, David)
May 2, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fiori, LLC. Obvious Clothing, LLC served on 5/2/2014, answer due 5/23/2014. (Blakely, Todd)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/1/14. Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale)
May 1, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, ) Modified to show correct Magistrate Pilot language on 5/1/2014 (sphil, ).
May 1, 2014 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (sphil, )
May 1, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
May 1, 2014 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Blakely, Todd)
May 1, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against OBVIOUS CLOTHING LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3850087)Attorney Todd P. Blakely added to party FIORI, LLC(pty:pla), filed by FIORI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Summons, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blakely, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiori, LLC v. Obvious Clothing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiori, LLC
Represented By: Pamela N. Hirschman
Represented By: Todd P. Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obvious Clothing, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen K. Custer
Represented By: Stephen Derek Bauer
Represented By: David Richard Fine
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?