Mendoza v. Line et al
Petitioner: Mario Mendoza
Respondent: Rick Line and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2014cv01254
Filed: May 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT in favor of The Attorney General of the State of Colorado, Rick Line against Mario Mendoza re: 23 Order Dismissing Case by Clerk on 1/26/15. (pglov)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing claim 3, and directing Respondents to answer, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/21/14. (dkals, )
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Drawing Case; This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/18/14. (morti, )
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER To File Pre-Answer Response by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/27/14. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Line et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?