198 Trust Agreement, dated December 15, 2010, and any amendments thereto, The v. CAAMS, LLC
Plaintiff: 198 Trust Agreement, dated December 15, 2010, and any amendments thereto, The
Defendant: CAAMS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01264
Filed: May 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER dismissing the Complaint, denying as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying without prejudice 36 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/30/15.(jdyne, )
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 7/29/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 7/29/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/2/14. (sgrim)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/4/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/4/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/8/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 198 Trust Agreement, dated December 15, 2010, and any amendments thereto, The v. CAAMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 198 Trust Agreement, dated December 15, 2010, and any amendments thereto, The
Represented By: Jon Jay Olafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAAMS, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Wartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?