Mott et al v. Narconon Fresh Start et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Mott and Nikki Mott
Defendant: Narconon Fresh Start, Association for Better Living and Education International and Narconon International
Case Number: 1:2014cv01293
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute Order. The case was dismissed with prejudice as of the entry of the parties' Stipulated Dismissal 98 . No order of dismissal is necessary. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/15/15. (jhawk, )
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/06/15. (jhawk, )
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. ORDERED that defendants Motion to Dismiss the First, Fifth, Seventh and Eighth Causes of Action in Plaintiffs' Section Amended Complaint [Docket No. 34] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as indicated in this order. ORDERED that plaintiffs' claims for intentional infliction of emotional distress, for negligent infliction of emotional distress, and for violation of the RICO statute are DISMISSED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/17/15.(jhawk, )
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 58 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Case Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Cases for Multidistrict Litigation. This case is STAYED pending transfer of this case to the MDL transferee court, if the MDL Motion is granted. Plaintiffs shall file a status report within five days of ruling by the MDL Panel if the MDL Motion is not granted, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/9/14.(sgrim)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/26/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/4/14. (sgrim)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims asserted against defendants Association for Better Living and Education International and Narconon International are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/31/2014. (athom, )
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/7/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/2/14. (sgrim)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/6/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/6/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/16/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mott et al v. Narconon Fresh Start et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Mott
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Mott
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narconon Fresh Start
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association for Better Living and Education International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narconon International
Represented By: Michael W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?