Matthys et al v. Narconon Fresh Start d/b/a A Life Worth Saving et al
Plaintiff: Charles Matthys, Tyler Matthys and Linda Phillips
Defendant: Narconon Fresh Start, Association for Better Living and Education International and Narconon International
Case Number: 1:2014cv01304
Filed: May 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Pursuant to the 72 Stipulated Dismissal of this Action in its Entirety, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/27/2015. (ebuch)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and 29 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), and granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs['] First, Fifth, Seventh, Eighth, and Tenth Causes of Action in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/4/15.(dkals, )
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Upon the Notice of Motion to Transfer 52 , all dates previously set in this matter are vacated and all motions pending are held in abeyance pending resolution of the Motion to Transfer, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/4/2014. (eseam)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and Vacate Current Discovery Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/16/2014. (eseam)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/12/2014. (emill)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form. Consent Form due by 6/26/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/9/2014. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthys et al v. Narconon Fresh Start d/b/a A Life Worth Saving et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Matthys
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Matthys
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Phillips
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narconon Fresh Start
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association for Better Living and Education International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narconon International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?