Ortega v. Denver Institute L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Ortega
Defendant: Denver Institute L.L.C. and Dale L. LeMonds
Case Number: 1:2014cv01351
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Final JUDGMENT in favor of Denver Institute L.L.C., Dale L. LeMonds against Nicole Ortega re: 37 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Clerk on 7/31/2015. (slibi, )
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/30/2015.(slibi, )
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/23/2015. (mdave)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/20/2015. Defendants shall submit a copy of their proposed protective order, in useable format (Word or Word Perfect) to my Chambers at hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov.(mdave) Modified on 1/21/2015 to edit file date (mdave). Modified on 1/21/2015 to add in the text Minute (slibi, ).
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/29/2014. Discovery due by 3/17/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2015. (mdave ) Modified on 12/30/2014 to add the text Minute (slibi, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Denver Institute L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ortega
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Institute L.L.C.
Represented By: Gregory Alan Eurich
Represented By: Joseph Neguse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale L. LeMonds
Represented By: Gregory Alan Eurich
Represented By: Joseph Neguse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?