Owens v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Owens
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01434
Filed: May 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/02/15. (jhawk, )
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER re: Defendant's 67 Notice of Settlement and Unopposed Motion to Stay Case Deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference set for March 31, 2016at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. Dismissal Papers due on or before 7/10/2015. The Motion 67 is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/15/15.(morti, )
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/27/15. (lgale, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. ORDERED that defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) [Docket No. 22] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that plaintiff Anthony Owens' sixth claim for relief is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's first, second, third, fourth, fifth, seventh, and eighth claims remain pending by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/23/15.(jhawk, )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that all discovery is STAYED pending resolution of the Partial Motion to Dismiss [#22]. ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the need for additional discovery and the time frames for completion of discovery within ten (10) days after entry of an Order adjudicating the Partial Motion to Dismiss [#22] by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/24/14.(jhawk, )
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims against defendant Bank of America, N.A. are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/07/14.(jhawk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Owens
Represented By: Collin Joseph Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Christy L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Melissa Louise Cizmorris
Represented By: Ian Trevor Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?