WildEarth Guardians v. Western Sugar Cooperative, The
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Defendant: Western Sugar Cooperative, The
Case Number: 1:2014cv01503
Filed: May 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Boyd N Boland
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1311
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's #37 Notice of Dismissal is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/14/2014. (alowe)
October 10, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians (Jerger, Robert)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting #34 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and to Extend Response Date on Western Sugar Cooperative's Motion to Dismiss and to Extend the Date for the Parties to Produce Documents Identified in Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/5/2014.(alowe )
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM regarding #34 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #30 Scheduling Order and to Extend Response Date on Western Sugar Cooperative's Motion to Dismiss and to Extend the Date for the Parties to Produce Documents Identified in Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by The Western Sugar Cooperative, WildEarth Guardians. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/5/14. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
September 5, 2014 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Modify #30 Scheduling Order and to Extend Response Date on Western Sugar Cooperative's Motion to Dismiss and to Extend the Date for the Parties to Produce Documents Identified in Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Defendant The Western Sugar Cooperative, Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Flink, Marc) Modified filers on 9/5/2014 (alowe).
August 25, 2014 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Flink, Marc)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Defendants Motion To Dismiss Pursuant Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6) [#32] filed August 25, 2014, is REFERRED for recommendation to Boyd N. Boland United States Magistrate Judge for the District of Colorado. This special order of reference modifies the general Order Referring Case [#9] entered June 2, 2014. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/25/14. (Text Only Entry) (rebsec) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conferences are set 9/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Seven (7) day Bench Trial set 9/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/14. (rebsec)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/19/14. (bsimm, )
August 19, 2014 Filing 29 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 8/19/2014 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings: September 12, 2014. Discovery cut-off: May 29, 2015. Dispositive motion deadline: June 30, 2015. The Proposed Scheduling Order is approved and entered with interlineations made by the court. FTR: Courtroom A-401. (bsimm, )
August 12, 2014 Filing 28 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Jerger, Robert)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #18 Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/11/2014.(trlee, )
August 8, 2014 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and (6) filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Jerger, Robert)
August 7, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #24 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jerger, Robert)
August 7, 2014 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Western Sugar Cooperative, The, filed by WildEarth Guardians.(Jerger, Robert)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonically. R. Scott Jerger may appear for the Scheduling/Planning Conference on August 19, 2014, at 9:30 a.m., Mountain Daylight Time, by calling Chambers at the appropriate time at 303-844-6408, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/28/14. Text Only Entry (bnbsec, )
July 28, 2014 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for R. Scott Jerger filed by WildEarth Guardians. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/28/14. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
July 28, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for R. Scott Jerger by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Jerger, Robert)
July 21, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians. Western Sugar Cooperative, The served on 6/5/2014, answer due 7/18/2014. (Wilmes, Ashley)
July 18, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and (6) by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Flink, Marc)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and (6) filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Defendants Motion To Dismiss Pursuant Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6) filed July 18, 2014, is REFERRED for recommendation to Boyd N. Boland United States Magistrate Judge for the District of Colorado. This special order of reference modifies the general Order Referring Case [#9] entered June 2, 2014. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/18/14. (Text Only Entry) (rebsec) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Marc David Flink (Flink, Marc)
July 3, 2014 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Flink, Marc)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/16/14. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm, )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/14. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for a Twenty-Eight (28) Day Extension of Time to Answer, Plead, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to the "Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties" #12 is GRANTED and defendant shall answer or otherwise respond on or before July 18, 2014. (bsimm, )
June 12, 2014 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/12/14. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
June 12, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion For A Twenty Eight Day Extension of Time To Answer, Plead, Move To Dismiss Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties)(Flink, Marc)
June 11, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin T. Winquist on behalf of Western Sugar Cooperative, TheAttorney Justin T. Winquist added to party Western Sugar Cooperative, The(pty:dft) (Winquist, Justin)
June 11, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc David Flink on behalf of Western Sugar Cooperative, TheAttorney Marc David Flink added to party Western Sugar Cooperative, The(pty:dft) (Flink, Marc)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, for non-dispositive motions.That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/2/14. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
June 2, 2014 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was reassigned in error. Due to the pending request for injunctive relief, the case is not eligible for the consent pilot program. The case is reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-01503-REB-BNB. (Text Only Entry) (smoor)
May 30, 2014 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (smoor)
May 30, 2014 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. All future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-01503-BNB. (Text Only Entry) (smoor)
May 30, 2014 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Lewis T. Babcock. (smoor)
May 29, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent form issued pursuant to Local Rule (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
May 29, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
May 29, 2014 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wilmes, Ashley)
May 29, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Sugar Cooperative, The (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3889352)Attorney Ashley Dye Wilmes added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla), filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wilmes, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians v. Western Sugar Cooperative, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Ashley Dye Wilmes
Represented By: Robert Scott Jerger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Sugar Cooperative, The
Represented By: Marc David Flink
Represented By: Justin T. Winquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?