Ellis v. Raemisch et al
Petitioner: Mark Stephen Ellis
Respondent: Rick Raemisch and John W. Suthers
Case Number: 1:2014cv01565
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Upon consideration of the Respondents Motion for Stay of Judgment Doc. 32 , it is ORDERED that enforcement of the 49 Amended Judgment entered on February 25, 2015, is stayed through issuance of a mandate from the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals if the Respondents file a timely notice of appeal, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2015.(evana, )
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 23 The Joint Motion for Corrections of Hearing Transcript, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/19/2014.(evana, )
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER it is ORDERED that Mark Stephen Ellis's Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28.U.S.C. § 2254 is GRANTED. The State of Colorado shall initiate new criminal proceedings against Mark Stephen Ellis within 90 days, failing which he shall be released from custody. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/12/2014. (evana, )
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT PETITION re 1 , 6 , and 8 : on or before October 23, 2014, counsel for Petitioner Ellis will supplement the Petition by filing transcripts of Petitioner's trial and the evidentiary hearing held in connection with his Colorado Rule of Criminal Procedure 35(c) motion for post conviction relief, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/2/2014. (jsmit)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING TIME FOR REPLY re 6 / 1 : the petitioner may file a reply to the Answer, filed today, on or before September 15, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/15/2014. (jsmit)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER re 1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Rick Raemisch answer due 8/18/2014; John W. Suthers answer due 8/18/2014, respondents shall answer the petition and the Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition and this order on the respondents, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/10/2014. (jsmit)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Raemisch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Stephen Ellis
Represented By: Gail Kathryn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John W. Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?