Green v. Humana Health Plan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: George R. Green
Defendant: Humana Insurance Company and Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01574
Filed: June 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER : Telephonic Motion Hearing set 10/7/2014 03:00 PM is vacated. Denying as Moot 41 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order; Denying as Moot 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Parties shall file dismissal papers within 30 days. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/7/2014.(emill)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/25/2014. (emill)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 7/24/2014, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 8 . Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Consent Form due by 7/24/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/5/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Humana Health Plan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Furman
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: Daniel Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George R. Green
Represented By: Melissa A. Hailey
Represented By: W. Randolph Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?