Rodell v. Objective Interface Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Rodell
Defendant: Objective Interface Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01667
Filed: June 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND AND OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT: OIS's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 58 is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Summary judgment is entered in favor of OIS and against Dr. Rodell on the claims for age discrimination, retaliation, promissory estoppel, and wrongful termination. OIS's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand 30 is DENIED. The parties are directed to begin preparation of a proposed Final Pretrial Order, in accordance with the Trial Preparation Order (#29) and shall jointly contact chambers within 14 days of this Order to schedule a final pretrial conference. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/15.(msksec, )
February 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LAttyR 5(b) by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/1/15.(dkals, )
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/27/2015. (emill)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 32 Unopposed Motion to File First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (Docket No. 32-1)is ACCEPTED FOR FILING. Defendants An swer to the First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 34) is STRICKEN because it was filed before the Court granted Plaintiffs motion for leave. Defendant is DIRECTED to re-file its Answer after the Clerk of Court has docketed the First Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/24/14.(morti, )
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/26/14. (msksec, )
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 8/13/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/23/2014. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodell v. Objective Interface Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Objective Interface Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathon Michael Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rodell
Represented By: Robert Chapman Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?