Glapion v. Donovan
Plaintiff: Meleaha R. Glapion
Defendant: Shaun Donovan
Case Number: 1:2014cv01699
Filed: June 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 108 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2015. The case is dismissed with prejudice, and costs shall be awarded in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 54.1.(mdave, )
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/05/2015.(slibi, )
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: denying 134 Motion for Administrative Closure; Motion Hearing held on 8/12/2015. Defendant has until 9/8/2015 to file her opposition to 106 Motion for Summary Judgment and 108 Partial Motion for Summary Judgment as set forth in 132 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Entry. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave, )
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 126 Brief in Opposition the Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/8/2015. The Court orders Plaintiff to file a new response by 8/3/2015. The Court VACATES the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 7/23/2015 and the jury trial scheduled for the week of 8/24/2015. Finally, the Court denies as moot 128 Motion for Leave to Conduct Preservation Deposition. (mdave, )
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2015. IT IS ORDERED THAT the plaintiff is to produce the boxes of documents to the defendant by close of business on 3/9/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 51 Motion to Dismiss Whistleblowing, Harmful- Procedural-Error, and Constitutional Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) (1) and 12(b)(6) by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/4/2015. Plaintiffs Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Claims for relief are dismissed. (mdave) Modified on 2/5/2015 to reflect this is an order (slibi, ).
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: taking under advisement 51 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement 51 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 90 Motion for Order to Enter Addendum to Protective Order. Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2015. Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial re-set for 8/24/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave, ) Modified on 2/2/2015 to edit text (mdave).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Compel; denying 78 Motion for Contempt; denying 78 Motion for Sanctions; granting 81 Motion for Leave; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Compel; denying 83 Motion for Sanctions; Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2015.Discovery due by 3/2/2015., Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2015., Trial Preparation Conference re-set fo r 7/1/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a transcript of these proceedings is to be filed into the record at the request of Magistrate Judge Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER denying 70 Motion to Compel Compliance to Enforce Subpoena; denying 70 Motion for Contempt Non-party Witness, Gary Mongelli; denying 70 Motion for Sanctions for Contempt; denying 73 Amended Motion for Contempt Sanctions and/or to Compel Compliance by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/30/2014.(mdave)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Trial Procedures ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/2014. (slibi, )
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct the Record, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/17/2014.(slibi, )
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER denied without prejudice 45 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/14/2014.(slibi, )
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/03/2014. (slibi, )
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 35 Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/02/2014. Defendant shall file an answer or a renewed motion to dismiss in response to the Third Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15.(slibi, )
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall file Plaintiff's Title VII Complaint, which is attached to the Plaintiff's motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/16/2014. (eseam)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Assigning Case. This case shall be assigned to a presiding judge and, if appropriate, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/08/14. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glapion v. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meleaha R. Glapion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?