ElHelbawy v. Pritzker et al
Plaintiff: Mona ElHelbawy
Defendant: Penny S. Pritzker and Thomas E. Perez
Case Number: 1:2014cv01707
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Penny S. Pritzker and against Mona ElHelbawy re: 51 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 02/22/16, nunc pro tunc 10/20/15. (nmarb, ) (Main Document 64 replaced on 2/22/2016) (nmarb, ). Modified on 2/22/2016 to add court seal. (nmarb, ).
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 39 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 09/21/15.(nmarb, )
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/06/2014. (cbslc1)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if appropriate to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/31/14. (nmarb, )
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/26/14. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ElHelbawy v. Pritzker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona ElHelbawy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny S. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?