Selanders v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Tracy Selanders
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2014cv01714
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Defendant will pay Plaintiff a total of $4,238.83 in EAJA fees. This amount is payable to Plaintiff, not directly to her counsel. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 04/02/15. (jhawk, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Court's decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302(1993). Plaintiff may have her costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs within fourteen days of entry of judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/9/2015. (babia)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Remand. ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g)1 and the case REMANDED to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings by Judge John L. Kane on 03/03/15.(jhawk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selanders v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Selanders
Represented By: Kristina Jo Vasold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?