Schniedwind v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Patricia Schniedwind
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv01734
Filed: June 20, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order. The case was dismissed with prejudice as of the entry of the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. No order of dismissal is necessary. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/09/16. (jhawk, )
January 13, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony of American Family Mutual Insurance Company's 30(b)(6) Representative Kenneth Ray Caudill re: 73 . Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 01/13/16. (jhawk, )
January 12, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 49 is DENIED. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/12/16.(pabsec)
October 2, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 2/1/2016 08:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/15/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/02/15. (jhawk, )
May 11, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify and VACATING Motion Hearing set for 5/12/15. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/11/15. (nywlc1)
April 27, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 04/27/15.(nmarb, )
April 9, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/9/2015.(agarc, )
July 21, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/17/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/21/14. (morti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schniedwind v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Schniedwind
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Barton
Represented By: Robert Dale Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?