Enger Family Partnership, LLLP et al v. EMCASCO Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Enger Family Partnership, LLLP and Enger Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: EMCASCO Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv01748
Filed: June 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The 100 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with prejudice is granted. All other pending motions, including those docketed as [# 44 & # 92 ] and the pending objection [# 98 ] are denied as moot. This action is dismissed with prejudice with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and cots. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/21/2015. (alowe) Modified filed date on 4/22/2015 (alowe).
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Untimely Disclosure of Non-Retained Expert Witnesses. Plaintiff's Disclosure of Non-Retained Experts Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(2) (C), submitted out of time on March 9, 2015, is STRICKEN. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/20/2015.(alowe)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/17/15. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order 61 is GRANTED. The Protective Order 63 is hereby AMENDED. (bsimm, )
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/2/15. (bsimm, )
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: The 34 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to accept the Second Amended Complaint [Doc. 35 ] for filing, subject to the stated limitation. The 38 Motion to Compel is DENIED as moot. The 48 Motion to Quash is GRANTED as specified. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/10/2014. (alowe)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/19/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 6/26/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set 7/13/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/4/14. (rebsec)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Third Claim For Relief, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/2014.(trlee, )
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/7/14. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enger Family Partnership, LLLP et al v. EMCASCO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enger Family Partnership, LLLP
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enger Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCASCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?