Hunter Douglas Inc. v. Throne et al
Plaintiff: Hunter Douglas Inc.
Defendant: Patent Services Group, Inc., Mary C. Throne and Jason T. Throne
Case Number: 1:2014cv01807
Filed: June 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stipulated Dismissal of Defendant Mary C. Throne and Exhibits re 34 : the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all claims against Defendant Mary C. Throne, as stipulated herein, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/21/2014. (jsmit)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/23/2014 11:00 AM in Conference Room, before Judge Richard P. Matsch, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/24/14. (dkals, )
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 24 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer: Defendants motion to dismiss or transfer, including the Rule 12(b)(6) motion is denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/9/20.(jsmit)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Courtrrom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Renewed Unopposed Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Order for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery 13 , is denied.FTR: KI. Terasaki. (jsmit)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/1/2014.(jsmit)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Douglas Inc. v. Throne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patent Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: George T. Dilworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C. Throne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason T. Throne
Represented By: George T. Dilworth
Represented By: Colin Andrew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Douglas Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Reed DeBord
Represented By: Randall H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?