Dawson, Jr. v. Two Unknown Nurses
Plaintiff: James Ralph Dawson, Jr.
Defendant: Two Unknown Nurses
Case Number: 1:2014cv01920
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 JUDGMENT in favor of Two Unknown Nurses (Oliveras), Meredith Lloyd against James Ralph Dawson, Jr. re: 65 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Clerk on 9/21/15. (pglov)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Take Judicial Notice by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/9/15.(dkals, )
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend... Parties (Unknown Nurses) to Reflect Correct Identities of the Defendants and Have Them Served with Complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/17/14.(dkals, )
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/9/14. IT IS ORDERED that on or before November 10, 2014, the plaintiff shall identify defendants "Two Unknown Nurses" sufficiently to effect service upon them. Failure to comply with this order will result in my recommendation that the Complaint be dismissed without prejudice as to the "Two Unknown Nurses." (bsimm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson, Jr. v. Two Unknown Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ralph Dawson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Unknown Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?