O'Mailia v. Tramcor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: David M. O'Mailia
Defendant: Darrell F. Kidmann, II and Tramcor Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv02064
Filed: July 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Moffat
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice 18 filed January 12, 2015, it is ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/12/2015. (evana, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference for 10/1/2014 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 25, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/11/2014.(jsmit)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/16/2014 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 11, 2014, lead counsel present in person, initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, and counsel for Defendant Tramcor Corporation shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/28/2014. (jsmit )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Mailia v. Tramcor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell F. Kidmann, II
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tramcor Corporation
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. O'Mailia
Represented By: Marilee E. Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?