Velez v. SCL Health-Front Range, Inc

Plaintiff: Susie Velez
Defendant: SCL Health-Front Range, Inc
Case Number: 1:2014cv02179
Filed: August 6, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting in part 25 defendant St. Joseph Hospital's Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendant and against plaintiff as to plaintiff's second cause of action. Within 14 days of the entry of this Order, defendant may have its costs by filing a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of the Court. The January 8, 2016 trial preparation conference and the January 19, 2016 trial are vacated. Since the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's state law claims, this case is remanded to the District Court for the City and County of Denver, where it was filed as Case No. 2014cv32544. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/23/15. (pabsec)
August 4, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2016 08:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/8/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/04/15. (jhawk, )
September 22, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/22/14. ORDERED that the Unopposed 16 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that when filing documents under seal parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2 and D.C.COLO. ECF. PROC. 5.1. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez v. SCL Health-Front Range, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Velez
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL Health-Front Range, Inc
Represented By: Carrie Anne Walsh Claiborne
Represented By: Mary Hurley Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?