Cousett v. People of Colorado, The et al
Petitioner: Preston Cousett
Respondent: People of Colorado, The and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2014cv02615
Filed: September 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying the 8 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Preston Cousett. No certificate of appealability will issue because Applicant has not made a substantial showing that jurists of reason would find it debatable whether the jurisdictional and procedural rulings are correct and whether the Application states a valid claim of the denial of a constitutional right. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/19/2015. (tscha, )
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to supplement State Court Record. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/2/2015. (tscha, )
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SECOND AMENDED ORDER for State Court Record, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/21/2015.(tscha, )
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re: 25 Order to Dismiss In Part and For Answer. The Court will vacate the Order to Dismiss in Part, as entered on January 15, 2015. Notwithstanding, the Court agrees, in toto, with the reasoning and analysis in the Order to Dismiss in Par t and, therefore, will adopt the Order as entered by the Court this date. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Order to Dismiss in Part (ECF No. 25) is deemed entered by the Court this date. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Dismiss in Part, as entered by Magistrate Judge Hegarty on January 15, 2015, is VACATED. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/20/2015. (tscha, )
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and for Answer, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/15/2015. ORDERED that claim two of re: 8 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254, filed by Preston Cousett, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as procedurally barred. ORDERED that Respondents shall file an Answer to claim one of the Amended Application within 30 days of this Order. (slibi, )
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for State Court Record; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send copies of this order to the following: Clerk of the Court, El Paso County District Court, P.O. Box 2980, Colorado Springs, Colorado 80901-2980; and Court Services Manager, State Court Administrators Office, 1300 BroadwayDenver, Colorado 80203, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/14/15. (morti, )
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER; 6 Letter to the Court requesting leave to file an Amended § 2254 Application is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/6/14.(morti, )
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/23/14. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cousett v. People of Colorado, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Preston Cousett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?