Frost v. Oil States Energy Services LLC
Plaintiff: Bradley Frost
Defendant: Oil States Energy Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv02663
Filed: September 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion To Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. §1404(A) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/23/15.(dkals, )
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Motions due by 8/19/2015. 5-Day Trial set for 2/1/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/8/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/25/2015. (alowe)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y Wang on 2/20/15 granting 17 Joint Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference. Counsel is instructed to initiate a conference call between themselves prior to calling Chambers at the appropriate time at (303) 335-2600. (bsimm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Oil States Energy Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Frost
Represented By: Richard Jennings Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oil States Energy Services LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?