Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company v. Law Office of Michael P. Medved, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Defendant: Law Office of Michael P. Medved, P.C. and Michael P. Medved
Case Number: 1:2014cv02905
Filed: October 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/19/15. (bsimm, )
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/28/15 re: Unopposed Motion for Stay 45 . The Motion is GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: the court ORDERS that this case be administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, subject to"reopening for good cause" pursuant to that rule. (bsimm, )
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/14/15 re: Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 43 . The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED: Discovery due by 11/30/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2015. Expert designations due by 9/25/2015. Rebuttal expert designations due by 10/12/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2015 is VACATED. The Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 2/16/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bsimm, )
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/13/15 granting 33 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify and granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Discovery due by 10/2/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang.(bsimm, )
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y Wang on 2/12/15 re: Plaintiff Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint 27 . The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is permitted to file a First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file and serve on Defendants the First Amended Complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. (bsimm, )
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/14. A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/12/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy in WordPerfect or Word format sent via e-mail to Boland_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 1/5/2015. (bsimm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company v. Law Office of Michael P. Medved, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: M. Courtney Koger
Represented By: Angela Rebecca Probasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Michael P. Medved, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Medved
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?