Powers et al v. FMNow LLC et al

Plaintiff: William Powers, MAP Management LLC and Black Widow LLC
Defendant: FMNow LLC, Emcon Associates Inc., Jon Mattei, Michael Cocuzza, Michael Michowski and Patricia Moscarelli
Case Number: 1:2014cv03006
Filed: November 5, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2017 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants Emcon Associates, Inc., Michael Cocuzza and Michael Michowski are awarded the total sum of $8,025.00 as sanctions against Plaintiffs for causing Defendants to incur needless attorney fees to have the offending non-disclosed discoverable documents stricken for use as was more fully explained in this courts Order [Doc. No. 123 ]. It is further ORDERED The total amount of $8,025.00 is due and payable from Plaintiffs to Defendants on or before thirty days from the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/27/2017. (jgonz, )
September 14, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 129 Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/14/20117. (jgonz, )
June 29, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/29/17 GRANTING 105 Defendants Motion to Strike Exhibits 36-39 to Reply in Support ofMotion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs Exhibits 36-39 (Doc. Nos. 102, 102-1, 102-3; Doc. No. 103-4) subm itted with their Reply in support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are stricken. It is further ORDERED that Defendants are awarded all reasonable costs of bringing the Motion toStrike Exhibits 36-39 to Reply in Support of Motion for Parti al Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 105, filed March 22, 2017), including attorneys fees for preparation of the motion and the reply. Defendants shall file their itemization of reasonable costs and fees on or before July 10, 2017.Plaintiffs shall have until July 17, 2017 to file any objection to the calculation of costs and fees. (nmarb, )
June 23, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion to Strike. Paragraph 16 of Plaintiff William Powers Declaration (Doc. No. 89 -7) and Exhibit 18 (Doc. No. 89 -14) are stricken and will not be considered in ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/23/2017. (jgonz, )
April 20, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Defendants' 61 Unopposed Motion for Order RequiringDisclosure and Production of Settlement Agreements is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/20/16.(morti, )
March 22, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Defendants' 28 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs claim of unjust enrichment against Defendant Michowski andCocuzza is dismissed. The remainder of Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Emcon, Michowski and Cocuzza will proceed, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/22/16.(morti, )
June 29, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Defendants' 29 Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. All discovery in this action is STAYED pending ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss and all deadlines and hearings established in the Scheduling Order are VACATED. No later than te n days after ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss, if any of this case remains pending, the parties shall file a Joint Status report advising whether the stay should be lifted and the Scheduling Order deadlines reset, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/29/15.(morti, )
June 8, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/8/15. (sgrim)
June 4, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 43 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Patricia Moscarelli is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/15.(morti, )
February 4, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 4/2/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 4/2/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/4/15. (sgrim)
November 12, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form; Consent Form due on or before 2/9/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/12/14. (morti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers et al v. FMNow LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Powers
Represented By: Steven M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAP Management LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Widow LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMNow LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emcon Associates Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cocuzza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Michowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Moscarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?