Great Northern Insurance Company et al v. NGL Warehouse, LLC
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company and Unique Home Designs, Inc.
Defendant: NGL Warehouse, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv03233
Filed: November 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument by NGL Warehouse, LLC Regarding the Reasonableness of the Settlement Amount Paid by Plaintiffs in the Underlying Texas Litigation 181 . By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/18/17. (pabsec)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 176 Defendant NGL Warehouse LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Testimony by Lay Witness Charles Reed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/17/17. (pabsec)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment on Contractual Indemnity Claim 142 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/22/16. (jhawk, )
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Depositions and Documents Designated as Confidential, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/24/16. (nmarb, )
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiffs' second claim for relief for statutory contribution is DISMISSED without prejudice by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/17/15. (jhawk, )
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/12/15.(jhawk, )
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/17/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/02/15. (jhawk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company et al v. NGL Warehouse, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett Marshall Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unique Home Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Marshall Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGL Warehouse, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?