United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Local No. 7 v. King Soopers,Inc.
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Local No. 7
Defendant: King Soopers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv03351
Filed: December 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/08/15 denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. This case is administratively closed, with the parties to submit a joint status report every 30 days commencing May 15, 2015.(nmarb, )
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTESMINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: taking under advisement 15 Motion to Dismiss by King Soopers; Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave,)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: denying 17 Motion to Stay Discovery. Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2015. Discovery due by 8/17/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Local No. 7 v. King Soopers,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Local No. 7
Represented By: John Patrick Bowen
Represented By: Jamie R. Scubelek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Soopers, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Myles Deeny
Represented By: Matthew M. Morrison
Represented By: Jonathon Michael Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?