Mallett v. Oliver et al
Plaintiff: Dawane Arthur Mallett
Defendant: J. Oliver, S. Beicker Gallegos, Paul G. Zohn and Kenneth Crank
Case Number: 1:2014cv03363
Filed: December 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of J. Oliver, Kenneth Crank, Paul G. Zohn, S. Beicker Gallegos and against Dawane Arthur Mallett by Clerk on 8/4/2015. Text Only Entry (vbarn)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Affirming 38 June 12, 2015 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge: Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Issue a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. # 27 ) is DENIED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/07/2015. (athom, )
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Take the Deposition of Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/10/2015.(emill)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Court to Serve Process on Each Defendant and Provide Plaintiff with a Copy of Service of Process. The portion of Plaintiff's motion that requests service on defendants is therefore denied without prejudice, and may be renewed in 45 days if necessary. The portion of Plaintiff's motion that requests a copy of the summons is thus granted. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/10/2015. (athom, )
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Status Conference. A Status Conference shall be held on 3/3/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/23/2015. (athom, )
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/12/14. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallett v. Oliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawane Arthur Mallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Beicker Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G. Zohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Crank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?