Echon et al v. Sackett et al
Plaintiff: Esmeraldo Villanueva Echon, Jr., Maribel Echon and Justin Echon
Defendant: William Sackett and Leonida Sackett
Case Number: 1:2014cv03420
Filed: December 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 18:1589
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Esmeraldo Echon is entitled to $40,022 in unpaid wages under the Colorado Minimum Wage of Workers Act/Colorado Minimum Wage Order and the Colorado Wage Claim Act, 50% of which is awarded against William Sacket t and 50% against Leonida Sackett. Esmeraldo Echon is entitled to $80,044 in non-economic damages for his claim of forced labor under 18 U.S.C. § 1589, 33% of which is awarded against William Sackett and 67% against Leonid a Sackett. Esmeraldo Echon is entitled to $120,000 in punitive damages under 18 U.S.C. § 1589, 50% of which is awarded against William Sackett and 50% against Leonida Sackett. Maribel Echon is entitled to $14,811 in unpaid wages under the Colorado Minimum Wage of Workers Act/Colorado Minimum Wage Order and the Colorado Wage Claim Act, 50% of which is awarded against William Sackett and 50% against Leonida Sackett. Justin Echon is entitled to $15,678 in unpaid wages under the Colorado Minimum Wage of Workers Act/Colorado Minimum Wage Order and the Colorado Wage Claim Act, 50% of which is awarded against William Sackett and 50% against Leonida Sackett. Justin Echon is entitled to  6;31,366 in non-economic damages for his claim of forced labor under 18 U.S.C. § 1589, 33% of which is awarded against William Sackett and 67% against Leonida Sackett. Justin Echon is entitled to $30,000 in punitive damages un der 18 U.S.C. § 1589, 50% of which is awarded against William Sackett and 50% against Leonida Sackett. Within 14 days of the entry of this Order, plaintiffs may have their costs by filing a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of the Court. This case is closed, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/4/18. (sgrim)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of Court's Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/9/18. (pabsec)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/02/2018, re: 184 Sanction Appeal filed by Leonida Sackett, William Sackett, is OVERRULED, 182 Request for Interpreter filed by Leonida Sackett, William Sackett, is DENIED. (sphil, )
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 01/11/2018. ORDERED that defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Proposal to Remove Witnesses 37 , which the Court construes as a Rule 72 objection to the magistrate judge's October 30, 2017 Recommendation and Order 134 , is OVERRULED. (sphil, )
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Docket No. 91 is ACCEPTED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) Sanctions Docket No. 83 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' request for default judg ment as to all claims is denied. Plaintiffs' request directing certain matters or designated facts be taken as established for the purposes of this action is granted, to be addressed in further detail at a later date. Plaintiffs' request that defendants be prohibited from introducing designated matters is granted, to be addressed in further detail at a later date. Plaintiffs may file a motion for summary judgment on or before April 10, 2017. The Court awards plaintiffs reasonable expenses not already awarded by the magistrate judge, see Docket No. 90, associated with their attempts to secure responses to the interrogatories, including but not limited to attorneys fees and costs associated with the motion for sanctions. Any motion for fees and costs shall be filed on or before March 27, 2017. Defendants' Motion to Vacate This Case Docket No. 87 is denied, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/24/2017. (evana, )
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 48 is ACCEPTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants William Sackett and Leonida Sackett's Motion to Vacate the Case 26 is construed as a motion for judgment on the pleadings and is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/14/16.(jhawk, )
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/27/16 granting in part and denying in part 60 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery. Consistent with the direction of this Order, Defendants must serve discovery responses to Interrogatorie s 1 (as limited) - 5, 7-16, and supplemental responses, including production of responsive documents, to Requests for Production No. 2-4, 6, 8, 10, and 11 on Plaintiffs no later than February 9, 2016; and no further extensions to the deadline for Defendants to respond to these discovery requests will be permitted.(nmarb, )
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/3/15. (bsimm, )
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A proposed protective order is due on or before October 15, 2015. Until the entry of a Protective Order, any documents produced by Defendants s hall be designated as attorneys' eyes only. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery 32 is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents on or bef ore 10/22/2015. If Defendants object to the questions, they must still answer them, but may also note objections. All parties shall comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure regarding discovery, including the verification of interrogatories. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: 3-Day Jury Trial set for 4/25/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/8/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/28/2015. (alowe)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/16/15. Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echon et al v. Sackett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeraldo Villanueva Echon, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawson Konvalinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Echon
Represented By: William Lawson Konvalinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Echon
Represented By: William Lawson Konvalinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonida Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?