GEF Services, LLC v. Casazza et al
Plaintiff: GEF Services, LLC
Defendant: Michael Sean Casazza, Jim D. Burford, Adrian Ramirez, Energy Transport Solutions, LLC, Patrick Leo Rusing and Unlimited Mobile Tire, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv03480
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Affirming and Adopting 53 December 21, 2015 Order and Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant Burford's motion to dismiss (Doc. # 21 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/11/2016. (athom, )
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Depositions of Patrick Leo Rushing and Unlimited Mobile Tire, LLC and Extending the Time to Respond to Discovery by Them Until, Thirty Days After They are Deposed, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/5/2016.(emill)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe (Doc. # 45 ), filed on June 16, 2015, is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. The claims against Defendant Adrian Ramirez are dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/08/2015. (athom, )
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/19/2015. Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Consideration of Defendant Jim D. Burford's Motion for Summary Judgment (docket no. 38 ) is GRANTED as follows finding good cause shown. Plain tiff shall take the depositions of Defendant Jim D. Burford and James White by 6/15/2015, as previously ordered. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 7/14/2015, to file any supplement Response to Defendant Jim D. Burford's Motion to Dis miss or, in the Alternative, Motion forSummary Judgment (docket no. 21 ). This court will defer ruling on Defendant Jim D.Burford' s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (docket no. 21 ) until on or after 7/15/2015. (athom, )
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/30/2014. Pilot Program Consent Form due on or before 2/17/2015. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/3/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEF Services, LLC v. Casazza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sean Casazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim D. Burford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Transport Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Leo Rusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unlimited Mobile Tire, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEF Services, LLC
Represented By: Brice A. Tondre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?