Chesapeake Enterprises, Inc. v. Online Consumers Network et al
Plaintiff: Chesapeake Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Online Consumers Network, Stephen Cole Kimball and Del Kimball
Case Number: 1:2014cv03511
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING CASE the 71 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed March 10, 2016. After a careful review of the Stipulation and the file, it is ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal is APPROVED and this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/28/2016. (evana, )
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER Granting 42 Plaintiffs Request for Status Conference with Defendants Counsel. Status Conference set for 9/29/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/10/2015.(evana, )
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER In light of the 39 Suggestion of Bankruptcy Re: Defendant Del Kimball filed August 12, 2015, and the Order of August 13, 2015, staying this case against that Defendant, Del Kimballs Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed March 16, 2015 ECF No. 18 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Status Report due by 8/24/2015. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/13/2015.(evana, )
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/18/15. (sgrim)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 4/14/2015 10:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/12/15. (sgrim)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/31/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/6/15. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chesapeake Enterprises, Inc. v. Online Consumers Network et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chesapeake Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Kali Backer
Represented By: Kenneth E. Chase
Represented By: Richard G. Sander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Online Consumers Network
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Cole Kimball
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Kimball
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?