Estate of Zackary Moffitt v. Minor et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Zackary Moffitt, M.M. and C.M.
Defendant: Erik J. Bourgerie, Cheryl Giordano, Jonathon Diurba, Nathan Fidler, Ryan Hosier, Brian Hyde, Kathy Lambert, Jeff Wilson, John Minor and John (I) Minor
Case Number: 1:2015cv00071
Filed: January 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion to Stay Case Additional 30 Days to Facilitate Settlement Negotiations, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/01/2016. Status Report due on or before 4/4/2016. (slibi, )
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Stay Case to Facilitate Settlement Negotiations. Case is STAYED until 2/29/2016 or until further order of the court, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/11/2016.(emill)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 23 is amended as to rebuttal experts as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/17/2015.(emill)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 29 is amended as to expert disclosures, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/28/2015.(emill)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/14/2015. (emill)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 3/18/2015 02:00 PM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/30/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/11/2015. (emill)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/20/2015. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Zackary Moffitt v. Minor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Zackary Moffitt
Represented By: Nicole Brianne Godfrey
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.
Represented By: Nicole Brianne Godfrey
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M.
Represented By: Nicole Brianne Godfrey
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik J. Bourgerie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Diurba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Fidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?