Valdez v. Derrick, III et al
Plaintiff: Michael Valdez
Defendant: Peter Derrick, III, John McDonald, Robert Motyka, Jr., Jeff Motz, Karl Roller, City of Denver, Peter (I) Derrick, III, John (I) McDonald, Robert (I) Motyka, Jr, Jeff (I) Motz and Karl (I) Roller
Case Number: 1:2015cv00109
Filed: January 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 335 Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Interest. Entered by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/1/2021.(lrobe)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER Denying 294 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Continue Trial by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/9/2021.(trvo, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Denying 256 Plaintiff's Second Motion in Limine by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/2/2021.(trvo, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting 235 Defendants' Motion to Amend the Final Pretrial Order. Defendants are DIRECTED to file their revised witness list on or before July 30, 2021. To the extent he chooses to do so, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file his second motion in limine on or before August 6, 2021. Defendants shall respond to the motion in limine on or before August 20, 2021. To the extent he chooses to do so, Plaintiff is permitted to supplement Mr. Montgomery's rebuttal expert disclosures in the manner described herein on or before August 6, 2021. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/23/2021.(trvo, )
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Granting Defendants' 210 Motion for Writ f Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum via Video Conference or, Alternatively, in Person. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint statement indicating whether the parties believe that the Court should impose any directives in the writs of habeas corpus ad testificandum relating to the manner in which Jude and Chuck Montoya should be permitted to testify no later than July 26, 2021. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/31/2021.(angar, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 167 Motion to Exclude by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/25/2021. (wjmlc2)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part both Defendants' 197 Joint Motion in Limine and Plaintiff's 199 Motion in Limine. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/24/2021.(angar, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Denver's Motion for Summary Judgment 181 , denying Denver's Motion to Bifurcate Trial 175 , denying as moot Denver's Motion to Strike 213 , and denying as moot Denver's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Strike 221 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/13/2020. (wjmlc1)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER regarding municipal liability discovery and dispositive motions, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/16/2019. (wjmlc1)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony 113 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/26/2019. (wjmlc1)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ON 82 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to John Macdonald, dismissing him from this civil action based on qualified immunity; and DENIED as to Robert Motyka, Jr., and the City and County of Denver, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/17/2019. (ktera)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying 15 defendants' Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/10/16. (ktera)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Upon consideration of the Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss 8 , plaintiff's response 9 and plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint 10 . Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall file a "clean" Amended Complaint on or before July 27, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/21/15.(ktera, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdez v. Derrick, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Valdez
Represented By: Laura A. Menninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Derrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Motyka, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Motz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter (I) Derrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) Motyka, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff (I) Motz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl (I) Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?