IT Portfolio, Inc v. NER Data Corporation

Plaintiff: IT Portfolio, Inc
Defendant: NER Data Corporation
Counter_claimant: NER Data Corporation
Counter_defendant: IT Portfolio, Inc
Case Number: 1:2015cv00179
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/20/16. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Third-Party Discovery 43 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and Plaintiff may serve a subpoena for documents upon Atlantic Tomorrow in conformance with Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than April 27, 2016. (bsimm, )
November 5, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record 24 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have counsel enter an appearance on or before December 11, 2015. A Status Conference is set for 12/14/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Verified Motion for Protective Order 26 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(d) 34 is DENIED with leave to refile. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
May 22, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/22/15. (bsimm, )
February 3, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/7/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/3/2014. (alowe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IT Portfolio, Inc v. NER Data Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IT Portfolio, Inc
Represented By: Robert C. Podoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NER Data Corporation
Represented By: James Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: NER Data Corporation
Represented By: James Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: IT Portfolio, Inc
Represented By: Robert C. Podoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?