Castillo v. Raemisch et al
Petitioner: Hector Castillo
Respondent: Rick Raemisch, John Suthers and Randy Lind
Case Number: 1:2015cv00195
Filed: January 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENTS TO PROVIDE STATE COURT RECORD Upon review of the Second Motion for Order Directing Respondents to Provide State Court Record 31 , Respondents shall, within 30 days, provide to the Court, in electronic format if possible, all available portions of the state court record in People v. Castillo, Arapahoe County case 05CR3826, that are necessary to resolve applicant's claims, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/26/15. (ktera)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR ORDER TO PROVIDE STATE COURT RECORD The Respondents shall submit an order that limits the requirements to the record that is necessary for this case, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/20/15. (ktera)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING ORDER FOR STATE COURT RECORD Order for State Court Record 15 entered by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on May 19, 2015, is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/20/15. (ktera)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for State Court Record, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/19/15. (morti, )
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/2/15. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Raemisch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Castillo
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Raemisch
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Lind
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?