Scarborough v. USA
Plaintiff: Aaron Scarborough
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2015cv00242
Filed: February 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 43 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 59 for Requested Relief by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/17/2017. (jgonz, )
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/15/16. Defendant's Second Motion for Leave to Depose Inmates, and Motion to Compel Appearance # 36 and Defendant's Motion to Reopen Discovery and Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline #[ 37] are deemed WITHDRAWN. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Motion for Leave to Depose Inmates and Motion to Compel Appearance [Doc. #36] # 38 and Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Motion to Reopen Discovery and Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline [Doc. #37] # 39 are GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Depose Inmate # 40 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Reopen Discovery and Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline # 41 is GRANTED. Discovery due by 3/24/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2016.(lgale, )
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER; Defendant's 34 Motion for Leave to Depose Inmates is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/11/16.(morti, )
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/22/16. Motion to Compel USP Lewisburg's Warden to Produce the Plaintiff's Discovery Materials to Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 and 34 # 31 is DENIED as moot.(lgale, )
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER; 25 Second Motion for Leave to Designate, Out-of-Time, Nonparty at Fault is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall accept Defendants Designation of Nonparty at Fault [#25-1] for timely filing as of the date of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/20/15.(morti, )
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER; Defendant's 20 Motion for Leave to Designate Out-of-Time, Nonparty at Fault is DENIED without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/18/15.(morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarborough v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?