Westroc Trucking, Inc. et al v. Frontier Drilling, LLC
Plaintiff: Westroc Trucking, Inc. and Westroc Oilfield Services, Inc.
Defendant: Frontier Drilling, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00245
Filed: February 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 02/24/2016.(cthom, )
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting 68 Second Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines Under Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 21 is amended as to expert deadlines and dispositive motions. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2016. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/17/2016.(emill)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 1/20/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/10/2015. (slibi, )
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Stipulated Motion to Extend Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/02/2015. Discovery due by 3/3/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/07/2016 is VACATED and RESET for 5/9/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/21/2015.(slibi, )
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER discharging 18 Order to Show Cause, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/20/2015. (tscha, )
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 3/23/2015, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 7 . Consent Form due by 3/23/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/6/2015. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westroc Trucking, Inc. et al v. Frontier Drilling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westroc Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L. Perschon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westroc Oilfield Services, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L. Perschon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Drilling, LLC
Represented By: Dana L. Eismeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?